Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ulrich Larsen | 10.02.2012 | 30.09.2013 | direktion |
Bent Gunnar Nielsen | 21.01.2012 | 10.02.2012 | direktion |
Mogens Villy Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 21.01.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Ulrich Larsen | 10.02.2012 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bent Gunnar Nielsen | 21.01.2012 | 10.02.2012 | bestyrelse |
Christoffer Ole Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Casper Mads Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Jacob Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Charlotte Johanne Couriol | 22.12.2011 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Bente Irene Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 30.09.2013 | formand |
Mogens Villy Hansen | 22.12.2011 | 21.01.2012 | bestyrelse |