Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Lønborg | 29.07.2014 | 22.09.2023 | adm. dir |
Adam Mathias Eithz Kromann | 08.01.2014 | 29.07.2014 | adm. dir |
Nicolas Nordlyng Förderer | 24.10.2013 | 08.01.2014 | adm. dir |
Casper Grønning | 15.12.2011 | 24.10.2013 | direktør |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjarne Lønborg | 29.07.2014 | 22.09.2023 | næstformand |
Charlotte Kristensen Lønborg | 14.05.2014 | 22.09.2023 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Esben Kristensen Lønborg | 14.05.2014 | 22.09.2023 | formand |
Adam Mathias Eithz Kromann | 14.05.2014 | 29.07.2014 | næstformand |
Nicolas Nordlyng Förderer | 15.12.2011 | 14.05.2014 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Martin Qvist Romme | 15.12.2011 | 14.05.2014 | formand |
Casper Grønning | 15.12.2011 | 24.10.2013 | bestyrelsesmedlem |