Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Sussemiehl | 01.03.2012 | 23.10.2012 | direktion |
El Bachir Mrabet | 27.01.2012 | 01.03.2012 | direktion |
Brian Sussemiehl | 24.11.2011 | 31.01.2012 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Brian Sussemiehl | 01.03.2012 | 23.10.2012 | formand |
El Bachir Mrabet | 24.11.2011 | 01.03.2012 | formand |