Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ronni Max Herringstad Sørensen | 11.12.2013 | 01.12.2014 | adm. dir |
Morten Weber From | 22.01.2013 | 11.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Amir Sdira | 01.07.2012 | 22.01.2013 | adm. dir |
Macide Cømert | 14.03.2012 | 01.07.2012 | adm. dir |
Jason Martin Broholm Nielsen | 08.03.2012 | 14.03.2012 | adm. dir |
Vedat Cømert | 28.10.2011 | 08.03.2012 | direktion |