Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kia Holm Reimer | 09.04.2014 | 06.10.2017 | direktion |
Louise Juul Fredbo-Nielsen | 09.04.2014 | 28.05.2015 | direktion |
Tina Moe | 20.10.2011 | 09.04.2014 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kia Holm Reimer | 09.04.2014 | 06.10.2017 | formand |
Louise Juul Fredbo-Nielsen | 09.04.2014 | 28.05.2015 | bestyrelse |