Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Steen Johansen | 13.01.2012 | 27.11.2013 | direktion |
Kim Sander Brink | 01.07.2011 | 13.01.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jørgen Hartmann Christensen | 13.01.2012 | 27.11.2013 | bestyrelse |
Klavs Bo Nygaard Larsen | 13.01.2012 | 27.11.2013 | formand |
Mik Sebastian Oddershede | 13.01.2012 | 07.10.2012 | næstformand |
Henrik Busch-Larsen | 13.01.2012 | 31.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Lars Overby | 01.07.2011 | 02.11.2011 | bestyrelse |
Poul Jensen | 01.07.2011 | 10.08.2011 | bestyrelse |