Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Randers | 26.05.2011 | 02.12.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Randers | 27.05.2011 | 02.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Mads Machon Randers | 27.05.2011 | 11.07.2014 | bestyrelse |
Nicklas Machon Randers | 27.05.2011 | 11.07.2014 | bestyrelse |