Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lise Bang Backer | 09.10.2012 | 31.03.2014 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Herholdt Froberg | 11.10.2013 | 25.05.2015 | formand |
David Martin Reis | 09.10.2012 | 25.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Nilas Bay-Foged | 09.10.2012 | 25.05.2015 | bestyrelse |