Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Horne Zartsdahl | 19.04.2011 | 07.03.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Christian Walther Øyrabø | 17.06.2011 | 06.06.2012 | formand |
Peter Horne Zartsdahl | 17.06.2011 | 07.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Sosun Sendi | 26.04.2011 | 06.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kamal Hameed Qureshi | 19.04.2011 | 06.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jakob Engel-Schmidt | 19.04.2011 | 06.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Martin Anton Jensen Boserup | 19.04.2011 | 17.06.2011 | formand |