Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mads Eriksen | 28.04.2014 | 27.06.2018 | direktion |
Martin Lykke Suhr | 07.03.2011 | 28.04.2014 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Thamdrup Lund | 23.10.2017 | 27.06.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Mads Eriksen | 28.04.2014 | 27.06.2018 | bestyrelse |
Niels Eilersen | 28.04.2014 | 23.10.2017 | bestyrelse |
Ejvind Henriksen | 07.03.2011 | 27.06.2018 | formand |
Martin Lykke Suhr | 07.03.2011 | 28.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Peter Haarmark | 07.03.2011 | 28.04.2014 | bestyrelse |
Morten Thoregaard | 07.03.2011 | 15.06.2011 | bestyrelse |