Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Esben Khan | 24.11.2017 | 21.01.2019 | direktør |
Kristian Foss | 01.12.2016 | 24.11.2017 | direktør |
Henrik Skriver | 30.05.2016 | 01.12.2016 | adm. dir |
Henrik Rathleff Johansen | 30.10.2013 | 30.05.2016 | adm. dir |
Poul Juhl Fischer | 09.03.2011 | 30.10.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Zheng Yao | 24.10.2018 | 21.01.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Esben Khan | 24.11.2017 | 21.01.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Lið | 01.12.2016 | 24.11.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Kevin Jeremiah Cahill | 30.05.2016 | 21.01.2019 | formand |
Kristian Foss | 30.05.2016 | 24.10.2018 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Skriver | 30.05.2016 | 01.12.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Mogens Rohde Nygaard | 30.10.2013 | 30.05.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Christian Fischer | 30.10.2013 | 30.05.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Henrik Rathleff Johansen | 30.10.2013 | 30.05.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Poul Juhl Fischer | 30.10.2013 | 30.05.2016 | formand |