Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Claus Christian Wildenschild | 01.01.2016 | 29.01.2019 | direktør |
Henning Christiansen | 01.08.2013 | 01.01.2016 | direktion |
Svend Kristian Hoff | 10.09.2011 | 18.06.2013 | adm. dir |
Gerrit van der Meer | 04.03.2011 | 10.09.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Christiansen | 18.06.2013 | 01.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Torben Brand | 04.03.2011 | 01.08.2013 | bestyrelse |
Svend Kristian Hoff | 04.03.2011 | 01.08.2013 | formand |
Johan Marinus Antonius Elisabeth Tax | 04.03.2011 | 18.06.2013 | bestyrelse |