Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Francesco Patarnello | 18.03.2011 | 18.05.2015 | direktion |
Matteo Danieli | 18.03.2011 | 13.05.2011 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 15.02.2011 | 18.03.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Luca Ferrari | 20.04.2012 | 18.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Francesco Patarnello | 13.05.2011 | 18.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Matteo Danieli | 13.05.2011 | 18.05.2015 | formand |
Michael Richard Jackson | 13.05.2011 | 27.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Simon Schock | 13.05.2011 | 20.04.2012 | bestyrelse |