Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Zahid Mushtaq Minhas | 11.05.2015 | 11.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Oubayd Amzourou | 13.04.2015 | 11.05.2015 | direktør |
Savvas Themistocleous | 07.11.2013 | 01.04.2015 | direktion |
Ramzan Aktulaev | 16.08.2012 | 02.04.2013 | direktion |
Miguel Bruno Nobrega Gouveia | 07.03.2012 | 22.04.2015 | direktion |
Peter Andreas Stakemann | 01.01.2011 | 07.03.2012 | direktion |