Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bjørn Meier | 22.12.2011 | 17.02.2012 | adm. dir |
Eskil Peter Lund | 22.12.2011 | 22.12.2011 | adm. dir |
Bjørn Meier | 11.01.2011 | 22.12.2011 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Knudsen | 22.12.2011 | 22.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Haulund Sørensen | 22.12.2011 | 22.08.2012 | formand |
Eskil Peter Lund | 22.12.2011 | 22.12.2011 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Engberg | 11.01.2011 | 22.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Peter Knudsen | 11.01.2011 | 22.12.2011 | formand |