Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Fristrup | 15.04.2011 | 06.02.2013 | direktion |
Lars Hagemann | 10.11.2010 | 15.04.2011 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Klaus Fristrup | 15.04.2011 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Flemming Mark Pedersen | 15.04.2011 | 06.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Lars Hagemann | 15.04.2011 | 14.11.2011 | bestyrelse |