Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Christian Høybye Olsen | 13.10.2010 | 02.12.2013 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Hellesen | 21.12.2012 | 02.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Claus Finderup Grove | 21.12.2012 | 02.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Louise Irgens Skov | 21.12.2012 | 02.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Michael Irvine Fenger | 21.12.2012 | 02.12.2013 | formand |
Allan Munk | 08.06.2012 | 21.12.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Høybye Olsen | 13.10.2010 | 02.12.2013 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Hess | 13.10.2010 | 08.06.2012 | formand |
Christian Loumann Jensen | 13.10.2010 | 18.07.2011 | bestyrelse |