Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Just | 01.08.2012 | 15.05.2013 | direktion |
Per Feldthaus | 01.06.2011 | 31.07.2012 | direktion |
Hans-Henrik Højberg Heming | 29.09.2010 | 01.06.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Peter Just | 29.09.2010 | 15.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Gustaf Iuel-Brockdorff | 29.09.2010 | 15.05.2013 | formand |
Hans-Henrik Højberg Heming | 29.09.2010 | 12.09.2012 | bestyrelse |