Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ruben Nørgaard | 01.10.2013 | 23.06.2017 | adm. dir |
Jens Christian Winther | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | direktion |
Ruben Nørgaard | 07.09.2010 | 24.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ruben Nørgaard | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Christian Winther | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kjeld Nielsen | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Jens Pedersen Handberg | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | bestyrelse |
Sheng Tang | 24.09.2010 | 01.10.2013 | bestyrelse |