Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Klith | 27.09.2013 | 14.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Tommy Waldemar Cosedis Holting | 17.01.2013 | 27.09.2013 | adm. dir |
Henning Stagsted | 04.04.2011 | 17.01.2013 | adm. dir |
Jesper Klith | 25.06.2010 | 04.04.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Carsten Hans Christoffersen | 27.09.2013 | 14.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Klith | 04.04.2011 | 14.11.2014 | bestyrelse |
Hans Magnus Kolby Hansen | 25.06.2010 | 14.11.2014 | formand |
Kent Ernst Hansen | 25.06.2010 | 27.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Henning Stagsted | 25.06.2010 | 04.04.2011 | bestyrelse |