Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Johannes Vestergaard | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
John Ivan Vestergaard | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Johanne Susi Nielsen | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Jeanne Bork | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
John Johannes Vestergaard | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Lilly Bente Vestergaard | 24.09.1971 | 31.10.1994 | bestyrelse |
Vilhelm Kjeldgaard Thuesen | 24.09.1971 | 30.10.1991 | bestyrelse |
Svend Evald Jensen | 24.09.1971 | 30.09.1988 | bestyrelse |