Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kurt Byskov | 05.05.2010 | 29.05.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Martin Prüss | 05.05.2010 | 29.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Kurt Byskov | 05.05.2010 | 29.05.2013 | bestyrelse |
Christian Buur Poulsen | 05.05.2010 | 29.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
René Hans Wittendorff | 05.05.2010 | 12.04.2011 | bestyrelse |