Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jimmy Patrick Jensen | 22.04.2010 | 22.03.2011 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jimmy Patrick Jensen | 22.04.2010 | 22.03.2011 | formand |
David Mark Würgler Damsholt | 22.04.2010 | 21.09.2010 | bestyrelse |
Christian Nicolaj Tobias | 22.04.2010 | 01.08.2010 | bestyrelse |