Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Lund Sørensen | 21.01.2020 | 16.08.2023 | adm. dir |
John Wehner | 01.08.2018 | 21.01.2020 | adm. dir |
Martins Niemands | 01.07.2016 | 01.08.2018 | adm. dir |
John Wehner | 01.08.2014 | 01.07.2016 | adm. dir |
Mads Dalby Hansen | 01.06.2014 | 01.08.2014 | adm. dir |
John Wehner | 15.06.2013 | 01.06.2014 | adm. dir |
Keld Scheel Knudsen | 15.04.2012 | 15.06.2013 | adm. dir |
Claus Gammelgaard | 15.11.2011 | 15.04.2012 | adm. dir |
John Wehner | 31.05.2011 | 15.11.2011 | direktør |
Arne Koch | 23.03.2010 | 31.05.2011 | direktør |