Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Imran Hussain | 15.12.2014 | 02.10.2015 | adm. dir |
Keld Leo Matyjasik | 30.01.2014 | 15.12.2014 | direktion |
Mahmoud Sbeihi | 15.05.2012 | 30.01.2014 | direktion |
Tabassum Shahzad Khokhar | 21.07.2010 | 30.04.2013 | direktion |
Raja Rehan Ul-Mustafa Khan | 08.03.2010 | 30.01.2014 | direktion |