Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Müller | 10.01.2014 | 23.09.2014 | direktion |
Håkan Lennarth Olof Franzen | 30.12.2011 | 10.01.2014 | adm. dir |
Henrik Müller | 27.01.2010 | 30.12.2011 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Müller | 10.01.2014 | 23.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Ulrik Hinke | 10.01.2014 | 23.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Nicolaj Vang Jessen | 10.01.2014 | 23.09.2014 | formand |
Torben Seebach | 30.12.2011 | 10.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Jens Friis Sørensen | 30.12.2011 | 10.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Håkan Lennarth Olof Franzen | 30.12.2011 | 10.01.2014 | bestyrelse |