Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Gustaf Iuel-Brockdorff | 22.05.2013 | 28.08.2014 | adm. dir |
Klaus Holmsberg | 10.09.2010 | 22.05.2013 | direktion |
Daniel Sigrist | 19.10.2009 | 10.09.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Marianne Lykke Sørensen | 22.05.2013 | 28.08.2014 | formand |
Jørn Eskildsen | 18.12.2009 | 03.02.2010 | bestyrelse |
Gustaf Iuel-Brockdorff | 19.10.2009 | 22.05.2013 | formand |
Daniel Sigrist | 19.10.2009 | 26.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Steen Arnesen | 19.10.2009 | 25.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Steen Arnesen | 19.10.2009 | 19.10.2009 | suppleant |