Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Arshad | 30.10.2009 | 13.12.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Nazih Ibrahim Chehabi | 26.01.2015 | 13.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Aasia Arshad | 12.12.2014 | 13.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Demal Ilazovski | 24.03.2014 | 26.01.2015 | bestyrelse |
Aftab Muhammad | 22.02.2013 | 12.12.2014 | bestyrelse |
Mohamed Sadek | 22.02.2013 | 24.03.2014 | bestyrelse |
Aasia Arshad | 17.11.2009 | 22.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Mohammad Arshad | 30.10.2009 | 13.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Demal Ilazovski | 30.10.2009 | 22.02.2013 | bestyrelse |
Peter Tauby Sørensen | 30.10.2009 | 17.11.2009 | bestyrelse |