Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Flemming Jensen | 24.08.2009 | 19.12.2017 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Ingvorsen | 12.03.2013 | 19.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Kim Sneftrup Tindbæk | 12.03.2013 | 19.12.2017 | suppleant |
Lars Bjørn Juul Andersen | 25.05.2012 | 12.03.2013 | bestyrelse |
Per Rene Bak | 24.08.2009 | 19.12.2017 | bestyrelse |
Christian Christensen | 24.08.2009 | 19.12.2017 | formand |
Gitte Uhre Thomsen | 24.08.2009 | 25.05.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jeanette Elisabeth Møllnitz | 24.08.2009 | 24.03.2012 | suppleant |