Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Yngve Lund Berthelsen | 01.10.2011 | 27.08.2016 | adm. dir |
Allan Bjørn Clausen | 30.06.2009 | 01.10.2011 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Allan Bjørn Clausen | 30.06.2009 | 27.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Yngve Lund Berthelsen | 30.06.2009 | 27.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Christine Laursen | 30.06.2009 | 27.08.2016 | bestyrelse |
Jens Frederik Griebel | 30.06.2009 | 03.02.2016 | formand |