Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bryan Göddert | 19.06.2012 | 20.06.2012 | direktion |
Tom Bøtcher | 27.04.2012 | 19.06.2012 | direktion |
Naeem Us Sahar Atif | 01.02.2012 | 19.06.2012 | adm. dir |
Jacob Andre Rathsach | 08.03.2010 | 01.02.2012 | direktion |
Angelo Gochuind Vincent | 01.07.2009 | 01.02.2012 | direktion |
Valentino Vincent | 01.07.2009 | 09.11.2010 | direktion |
Jacob Andre Rathsach | 01.07.2009 | 04.03.2010 | direktion |