Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Finn Ladefoged Gregersen | 01.07.2009 | 27.04.2012 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Bang Haulrik | 16.08.2011 | 27.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kristian Sloth Petersen | 16.08.2011 | 27.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Svend Hjorth | 16.08.2011 | 27.04.2012 | formand |
Flemming Poulfelt | 23.11.2009 | 27.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Anette Storm | 01.07.2009 | 16.08.2011 | bestyrelse |
Claus Berner Nielsen | 01.07.2009 | 16.08.2011 | formand |
Poul Rask Andersen | 01.07.2009 | 26.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Lars Schjønning | 01.07.2009 | 23.11.2009 | bestyrelse |
Finn Ladefoged Gregersen | 01.07.2009 | 01.07.2009 | bestyrelse |