Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Thomas Bo Sømod | 19.05.2009 | 09.06.2015 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jannich Kiholm Lund | 30.09.2014 | 09.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Kryhlmand | 30.09.2014 | 09.06.2015 | formand |
Christoffer Jonathan Carl Holten | 25.02.2014 | 30.09.2014 | formand |
Bjarne Grøn | 15.01.2014 | 09.06.2015 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Fensholt | 15.01.2014 | 30.09.2014 | bestyrelse |
Karen Nielsen | 15.01.2014 | 25.02.2014 | formand |
Thomas Bo Sømod | 19.05.2009 | 15.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Holm Seelig | 19.05.2009 | 15.01.2014 | bestyrelse |
Michael Nielsen Brendborg | 19.05.2009 | 15.01.2014 | formand |
Esmir Juhl Ibricic | 19.05.2009 | 31.05.2012 | bestyrelse |