Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Bertrand de Nully | 29.04.2009 | 07.03.2016 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Malling Madsen | 12.04.2013 | 07.03.2016 | formand |
Lars Bertrand de Nully | 17.06.2009 | 07.03.2016 | bestyrelse |
Chris Dahl Coster | 17.06.2009 | 23.09.2015 | bestyrelse |
Stig Hølledig | 17.06.2009 | 12.04.2013 | formand |