Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Erik Steffen Enemark | 30.09.2013 | 27.01.2014 | direktion |
Birgitte Enemark | 24.04.2009 | 30.09.2013 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Orla Gudmund Larsen | 18.02.2011 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Birgitte Enemark | 05.05.2009 | 30.09.2013 | bestyrelse |
Erik Steffen Enemark | 05.05.2009 | 30.09.2013 | formand |
Ove Brandt | 05.05.2009 | 18.02.2011 | bestyrelse |