Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mogens Gamst | 27.03.2009 | 09.10.2009 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Dyngbo | 27.03.2009 | 17.01.2011 | formand |
Jan Gerhard Nielsen | 27.03.2009 | 11.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Ingemann Jensen | 27.03.2009 | 11.10.2009 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Gamst | 27.03.2009 | 09.10.2009 | bestyrelse |