Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Kim Krøis | 01.04.2015 | 08.07.2016 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Erik Hemmingsen | 01.07.2011 | 08.07.2016 | formand |
Jens Kristian Kjærulff Damsgaard | 06.05.2011 | 01.04.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jørgen Eriksson | 01.03.2009 | 08.07.2016 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Mollerup | 01.03.2009 | 01.07.2011 | formand |
Leif Bjarne Jensen | 01.03.2009 | 06.05.2011 | bestyrelse |