Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jon Friis | 19.05.2010 | 13.09.2012 | adm. dir |
Jarl Friis | 16.01.2009 | 13.09.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jon Friis | 03.02.2011 | 13.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Ingrid Nielsen | 03.02.2011 | 13.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jarl Friis | 06.01.2010 | 13.09.2012 | bestyrelse |
Kenneth Larsen | 06.01.2010 | 03.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Arne Winther | 06.01.2010 | 03.02.2011 | bestyrelse |