Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Wohlert Fournaise | 08.09.1997 | 25.01.2001 | direktion |
Jan Ezra Neverdahl Petersen | 29.01.1960 | 02.09.1991 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Wohlert Fournaise | 29.01.1960 | 02.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Ove Mejlandt Henningsen | 29.01.1960 | 02.09.1991 | bestyrelse |
Jan Ezra Neverdahl Petersen | 29.01.1960 | 02.09.1991 | formand |