Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Tine Weppler | 28.11.2008 | 24.08.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Fogtdal Nøjgaard | 25.06.2012 | 24.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jan Holm-Henriksen | 01.05.2009 | 25.06.2012 | bestyrelse |
Bjarne Ponikowski | 28.11.2008 | 24.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Stig Andersen | 28.11.2008 | 24.08.2012 | formand |
Per Hedeman | 28.11.2008 | 01.05.2009 | bestyrelse |