Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mali Berthelsen | 23.08.2009 | 13.01.2017 | direktion |
Hasan Ali Gole | 11.09.2008 | 23.08.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Mali Berthelsen | 11.09.2008 | 19.11.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Berthelsen | 11.09.2008 | 19.11.2012 | formand |
Hasan Ali Gole | 11.09.2008 | 31.03.2010 | bestyrelse |