Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jesper Faber Stuhr | 01.08.2008 | 18.05.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Simon Pelman | 23.09.2010 | 18.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Stephen Kenneth Smith | 23.09.2010 | 18.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Avi Outmezguine | 11.08.2008 | 18.05.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jonathan Brereton Bulkeley | 11.08.2008 | 23.09.2010 | bestyrelse |