Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Ralf Magnussen | 01.06.2020 | 28.06.2021 | adm. dir |
Lars Folman Skovby | 01.03.2019 | 31.05.2020 | adm. dir |
Morten Lübbers Halborg | 14.11.2014 | 28.02.2019 | adm. dir |
Thomas Kield Jensen | 01.07.2008 | 14.11.2014 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henrik Engmark | 03.06.2019 | 28.06.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Thomas Møller | 01.01.2019 | 28.06.2021 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Nils Bo Normann Rasmussen | 01.01.2019 | 28.06.2021 | formand |
Ralf Magnussen | 01.01.2019 | 31.05.2020 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jesper Grundvad Bjerre | 01.01.2019 | 29.05.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Hans Krister Malmsten | 16.05.2017 | 01.01.2019 | formand |
Johan Anders Jonsson | 04.04.2017 | 01.01.2019 | næstformand |
Johan Anders Jonsson | 04.04.2016 | 03.04.2017 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Hans Krister Malmsten | 12.01.2016 | 15.05.2017 | næstformand |
Lene Camilla Groth Andersen | 01.10.2015 | 01.01.2019 | bestyrelsesmedlem |
Jette Jakobsen | 01.06.2013 | 16.05.2017 | bestyrelse |
Jens Erik Jepsen Christensen | 25.04.2013 | 16.05.2017 | formand |
Jim Johan Gunnar Rotsman | 16.04.2012 | 29.02.2016 | bestyrelse |
Per Anders Viktor Wahlström | 16.04.2012 | 12.01.2016 | næstformand |
Hans Krister Malmsten | 16.04.2012 | 11.01.2016 | bestyrelse |
Lars Göran Ragnar Orrevall | 16.04.2012 | 25.04.2013 | formand |
Nils Bolmstrand | 28.04.2011 | 16.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Bradley Justin Shearer | 28.04.2011 | 21.03.2012 | bestyrelse |
Frank Finne Mortensen | 19.03.2010 | 16.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Stephen James Hardwick | 19.03.2010 | 28.04.2011 | bestyrelse |
Charsten Christensen | 01.07.2008 | 16.04.2012 | formand |
Charlotte Høholt | 01.07.2008 | 19.03.2010 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Henrik Busch | 01.07.2008 | 22.02.2010 | næstformand |