Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Michael Leo Pierce | 17.06.2009 | 08.09.2011 | direktion |
Lars Hougaard Bak | 15.12.2008 | 17.06.2009 | direktion |
Kent Thomsen | 12.06.2008 | 15.12.2008 | direktion |
Dennis Thomsen | 12.06.2008 | 12.06.2008 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Jens Borring | 12.06.2008 | 08.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
Dennis Thomsen | 12.06.2008 | 08.09.2011 | bestyrelse |
Thomas Charles Ensign | 12.06.2008 | 08.09.2011 | bestyrelse |