Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Østergaard | 29.05.2009 | 13.08.2010 | direktion |
Steen Møller Jensen | 09.06.2008 | 29.05.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Keld Østergaard | 29.05.2009 | 13.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Martin Skovholm | 28.08.2008 | 13.08.2010 | bestyrelse |
Ole Kroghave Hartvig | 28.08.2008 | 13.08.2010 | formand |
Thomas Birkedal | 28.08.2008 | 29.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Steen Møller Jensen | 09.06.2008 | 28.08.2008 | bestyrelse |
Karsteen Østergaard | 09.06.2008 | 28.08.2008 | bestyrelse |