Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Johnny Hauberg | 01.06.2008 | 31.10.2015 | adm. dir |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Anders Nielsen | 10.08.2011 | 31.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Peter Fisker Bjerg | 10.08.2011 | 28.02.2015 | formand |
Arne Bredo Traagstad | 12.06.2008 | 21.02.2011 | bestyrelse |
Johnny Hauberg | 01.06.2008 | 31.10.2015 | bestyrelse |
Lars Jeppesen | 01.06.2008 | 21.02.2011 | bestyrelse |