Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Biil | 01.04.2008 | 06.08.2009 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Biil | 01.04.2008 | 06.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Helen Mimi Janniche | 01.04.2008 | 06.08.2009 | bestyrelse |
Kristina Skalberg Sejersen | 01.04.2008 | 31.05.2009 | bestyrelse |
Victor Christoffersen | 01.04.2008 | 01.06.2008 | formand |