Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Bent Rulle | 20.05.2010 | 03.12.2015 | direktion |
Eric Thomas Christiansen | 31.03.2008 | 20.05.2010 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Roald Thomsen | 07.04.2012 | 03.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Carsten Bjørn Pedersen | 20.05.2010 | 03.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Bent Rulle | 20.05.2010 | 03.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Brian Kjær Valentin | 20.05.2010 | 03.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Jens Jørgen Nielsen | 20.05.2010 | 03.12.2015 | bestyrelse |
Christian Jerup Andersen | 31.03.2008 | 07.04.2012 | bestyrelse |
Eric Thomas Christiansen | 31.03.2008 | 20.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Klaus Rosenfeldt Hansen | 31.03.2008 | 20.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Erik Vinther Poulsen | 31.03.2008 | 20.05.2010 | bestyrelse |
Kim Wiis Rulle | 31.03.2008 | 20.05.2010 | bestyrelse |