Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Aae Mouritsen | 07.04.2008 | 25.10.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Lars Aae Mouritsen | 07.04.2008 | 25.10.2012 | bestyrelse |
Mogens Aae Mouritsen | 07.04.2008 | 17.12.2010 | bestyrelse |
René Rasmussen | 07.04.2008 | 15.12.2010 | formand |