Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Morten Stevn Nielsen | 05.08.2012 | 20.08.2012 | direktion |
Jesper Stevn | 01.02.2008 | 05.08.2012 | direktion |
Historik | Start | Stop | Rolle |
---|---|---|---|
Henning Lauritsen | 01.05.2009 | 20.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Jesper Stevn | 01.02.2008 | 20.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Morten Stevn Nielsen | 01.02.2008 | 20.08.2012 | bestyrelse |
Carl-Emil Ulrick von Arenstorff | 01.02.2008 | 31.12.2008 | bestyrelse |